Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernardo Navarro Allende, O. de M. †

Deceased

Master General Emeritus of Order of Our Lady of Mercy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1911BornPlacilla de San Fernando
1 Jan 192816.3ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
15 Sep 193221.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
27 Dec 193423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
3 Nov 196251.1AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1974¹62.3ResignedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
9 Oct 197968.1DiedMaster General Emeritus of Order of Our Lady of Mercy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Navarro Allende:
Priest Bernardo Navarro Allende O. de M. (born , died ) Master General Emeritus of Order of Our Lady of Mercy

  • a priest for 44.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013