Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Morini

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1435AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
2 Feb 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
24 Oct 1440DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Louis Morini:
Bishop Louis Morini (died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 180
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,725

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013