Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Le Jeune

Deceased

Bishop of Thérouanne

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1411¹BornArras
10 Jan 143120.0AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
26 Apr 143322.3AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
24 Oct 143625.8AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
18 Dec 143929.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144029.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
1441¹30.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
9 Sep 145140.7DiedBishop of Thérouanne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Le Jeune:
Cardinal Jean Le Jeune (died ) Bishop of Thérouanne

  • a cardinal for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 86, and Page 196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 331
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013