Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Morgan

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jun 1419AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 1419Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 1424SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
27 Feb 1426AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
25 Oct 1435DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Philippe Morgan:
Bishop Philippe Morgan (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,828
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 338
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 60
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013