Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Langdon, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1421AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
7 Jun 1422Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 1434DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Langdon
Bishop John Langdon O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 566
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 422
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,670

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Oct 2020

Quantcast