Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pietro Moretti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Tongzhou [Tungchow]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1888BornCabernardi, Italy
190415.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Jun 191426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Apr 193243.9AppointedSuperior of Tungchow [Tongzhou], China
8 Apr 193546.9AppointedPrefect of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China
197384.6DiedPrefect of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China

MicroData Summary for Pietro Moretti:
Priest Pietro Moretti O.F.M. (born ) Prefect of Tongzhou [Tungchow]

  • a priest for 58.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013