Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Monissart

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1483AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
28 Mar 1486Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
11 Aug 1491DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Monissart (VIAF: 77382303)
Bishop Jean Monissart (died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1486, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Dec 2018

Quantcast