Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Climent Avinent

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1706BornCastellón
21 Jul 176660.4AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
23 Nov 176660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
16 Aug 177569.4ResignedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
28 Nov 178175.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Climent Avinent:
Bishop José Climent Avinent (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 84, Number 425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013