Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Romualdo M. Migliorini, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Swaziland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1884Born
16 Jul 190117.0Simple VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
31 Oct 190521.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
13 Jun 190823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
8 Jul 193349.0AppointedPrefect of Swaziland
193954.5ResignedPrefect of Swaziland
10 Jul 195369.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Swaziland

MicroData Summary for Romualdo M. Migliorini
Father Romualdo M. Migliorini O.S.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Swaziland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolegno, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Death PlaceCarsoli, Archdiocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast