Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Klemens August Maria von Merle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Bethsaida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1732BornBonn
3 Mar 175421.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Sep 175523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Jul 179765.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Jul 179765.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
8 Sep 179765.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
4 Jan 181077.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Klemens August Maria von Merle
Bishop Klemens August Maria von Merle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016