Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Marzi de’ Medici

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1557Born
12 Feb 159638.4AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
19 Feb 159638.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
27 Jun 160547.8AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
13 Aug 163072.9DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Marzi de’ Medici (VIAF: 34561127)
Archbishop Alessandro Marzi de’ Medici (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopS.Silvestre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188, and Page 187
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 175
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast