Catholic-Hierarchy DC

György Cardinal Drašković

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1515Born
1539²23.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 156045.4AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
11 Nov 156348.7SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
22 Mar 156449.1ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
25 Apr 157863.2SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
27 Oct 157863.7ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
30 Apr 158267.2AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
18 Dec 158570.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jan 158771.9DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Drašković (VIAF: 5363282)
György Cardinal Drašković (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZilina
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVienna, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Győr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 280, and Page 172
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 216, and Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 50*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast