Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1547Born
16 Nov 158639.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158739.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
20 Apr 158740.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
11 Sep 158740.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
20 Mar 158942.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
16 Feb 159245.0AppointedCardinal-Priest
9 Mar 159245.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
8 Dec 160356.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Mattei (VIAF: 3279589)
Girolamo Cardinal Mattei (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast