Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Valentino Cardinal Mastrozzi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1729Born
23 Feb 180171.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
23 Feb 180171.5Elevated to Cardinal
13 May 180979.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

MicroData Summary for Valentino Mastrozzi
Valentino Cardinal Mastrozzi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerni, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast