Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Massa

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1607BornMelfi
18 Sep 164538.2AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
8 Oct 164538.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
25 Sep 165144.3AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
30 Dec 165447.5DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Massa:
Bishop Andrea Massa (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141, and Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015