Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Marsh

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jun 1217AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
2 Jul 1217Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
1 May 1226DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Marsh
Bishop Richard Marsh (died ) Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Oswald, Gloucester

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 285
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,802

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast