Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Martínez de Salas, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572¹Born
10 May 162553.3SelectedBishop of Panamá
27 Oct 162553.8ConfirmedBishop of Panamá
18 Jan 162654.0Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
7 Jul 162654.5InstalledBishop of Panamá
22 Oct 164068.8DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Martínez de Salas
Bishop Cristóbal Martínez de Salas O. Praem. (born 1572, died ) Bishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina del Campo, Spain

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 272
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 148, Number 940
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast