Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan López, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
5 Jun 159571.4AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
11 Jun 159571.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
15 Nov 159874.8AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1608²84.0ResignedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1632²108.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan López (VIAF: 51680585)
Bishop Juan López O.P. (born 1524, died 1632) Bishop Emeritus of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopMontserrat Ste Marie, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 248
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 108, Number 683
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 15
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast