Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso López Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note/Previous Titular See: (appointment to Avila after death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
17 Sep 161267.7AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
18 Feb 162479.1SelectedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
29 May 162479.4ConfirmedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
1 Jul 162782.5DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
5 Jul 162782.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Alfonso López Gallo
Bishop Alfonso López Gallo (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 129, Number 823
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast