Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Margarit, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1475AppointedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
8 Feb 1479AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
3 Nov 1479Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
1486¹DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Margarit
Bishop Bernardo Margarit O.S.B. (died 1486) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Catania, Diocese of Catania

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122, and Page 125
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 29 Nov 2018

Quantcast