Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Cardona

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1531AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
30 Aug 1545Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
1 Feb 1546DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Cardona:
Bishop Juan Cardona (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013