Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiberio Mandosi

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
11 Dec 160652.9AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
24 Dec 160652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
3 Nov 160753.8DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Mandosi
Bishop Tiberio Mandosi (born 1554, died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 246
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 41
  • b: CB, 19 May 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017