Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Maiorana (Romano), C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Oct 1578AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
13 Nov 1581AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
13 Nov 1586DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Maiorana (Romano)
Bishop Marcello Maiorana (Romano) C.R. (died ) Bishop of Acerra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 93
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast