Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabian Luzjański

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470¹Born
5 Apr 151242.2SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
27 Aug 151242.6ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
5 Dec 151242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
30 Jan 152353.0DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabian Luzjański
Bishop Fabian Luzjański (born 1470, died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrólewiec
Ordained BishopPiotrków Trybunalski
Death PlaceLidzbark Warminski

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,984
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 May 2018

Quantcast