Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arcangelo Lupi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1693BornDubrovnik
19 Sep 171622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Jul 175763.7AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
24 Jul 175763.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
27 Mar 176672.4DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Lupi:
Archbishop Arcangelo Lupi O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015