Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Paolo Lunardon, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1930Born
4 Nov 195222.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Jul 195626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Nov 199262.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
20 May 199564.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
25 Jul 199767.1AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
1 Apr 200574.8RetiredAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
11 Oct 201787.3DiedAbbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Lunardon (VIAF: 55480345)
Abbot Paolo Lunardon O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuasso al Monte, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestMontecassino, Abbey, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino
Death PlaceSan Giacomo, Monastery, Pontida, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a priest for 61.2 years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • d: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast