Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Lucini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1656BornOlgiate
8 Dec 168125.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Dec 168125.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 172568.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
25 Mar 172568.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
23 Mar 172972.3DiedTitular Bishop of Capsus

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Lucini:
Bishop Girolamo Lucini (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Capsus

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015