Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Isidor Hermengild Hintringer (da Losenstein), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Jiamusi [Kiamusze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1905Born
1920²14.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jul 192823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Apr 194034.9AppointedPrefect of Jiamusi [Kiamusze], China
1983²77.6ResignedPrefect of Jiamusi [Kiamusze], China
1990²84.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Jiamusi [Kiamusze], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidor Hermengild Hintringer (da Losenstein)
Father Isidor Hermengild Hintringer (da Losenstein) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died 1990) Prefect Emeritus of Jiamusi [Kiamusze]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLosenstein, Tirol
Death PlaceHoch-Rum, Diocese of Innsbruck, Austria

  • a priest for 61.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,981
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 9 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast