Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Lorraine-Chaligny, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1592BornKoeur
19 Oct 161018.2AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
30 Oct 161624.2Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
22 Apr 162229.7ResignedBishop of Verdun, France
11 Jun 162229.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
28 Apr 163138.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Lorraine-Chaligny:
Bishop Charles de Lorraine-Chaligny S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Feb 2015