Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne Le Maingre de Boucicault, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornArles
24 Mar 160442.2AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
30 May 160442.4Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
17 Apr 162462.2DiedBishop of Grasse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne Le Maingre de Boucicault:
Bishop Étienne Le Maingre de Boucicault O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Grasse

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015