Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Lippomano

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1516AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
29 Jun 1530Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
18 Feb 1544AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
9 Aug 1548DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Lippomano
Bishop Pietro Lippomano (died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Church, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132, and Page 331
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,530, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast