Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Stuart, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹BornCulfeightrin
29 Aug 174055.6SelectedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
19 Sep 174055.7ConfirmedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
24 Nov 174055.8Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
6 Jun 175065.4DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Stuart:
Bishop Francis Stuart O.F.M. (born 1685, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015