Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Leuchtenberg, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1328AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
15 May 1328Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Mar 1329DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Leuchtenberg (VIAF: 62624584)
Bishop Friedrich von Leuchtenberg O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,909

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast