Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Cardinal de Lénoncourt

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1527¹Born
30 May 155023.4AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
13 Apr 155629.2ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
7 Feb 156033.0AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
16 Dec 156235.9ResignedBishop of Auxerre, France
16 Nov 158659.8Elevated to Cardinal
1588²61.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
15 Jan 158861.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
13 Dec 159265.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Auxerre, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Lénoncourt (VIAF: 187596755)
Philippe Cardinal de Lénoncourt (born 1527, died ) Prefect of Index

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorraine
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims, France

  • a cardinal for 6.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast