Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Lee

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1482¹Born
20 Oct 153149.8AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
10 Dec 153149.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
13 Sep 154462.7DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Lee:
Archbishop Edward Lee (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 12.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 190
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013