Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Maria Landolina Nava

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Siracusa, Italy

Titular Bishop of Medea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1708³Born
22 Dec 173123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa, Italy
1 Jun 177263.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siracusa, Italy
1 Jun 177263.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
2 Aug 177263.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Maria Landolina Nava
Bishop Sebastian Maria Landolina Nava (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiracusa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 283, and Page 451
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast