Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Maria Spinelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1717BornPalermo
1733¹15.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
8 Sep 174022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
10 Jul 176749.8AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
12 Jul 176749.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
Mar 1770³52.4DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Spinelli:
Archbishop Giovanni Maria Spinelli C.R. (born , died Mar 1770) Archbishop of Messina

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015