Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dominic Langenbacher, C.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Shenchow, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1884Born
16 Jan 190016.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
30 Jun 190622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
16 Jul 192541.5AppointedPrefect of Shenchow, China
Jan 1930³45.9ResignedPrefect of Shenchow, China
6 Jun 193955.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Shenchow, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominic Langenbacher
Father Dominic Langenbacher C.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Shenchow

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
Death PlaceLouisville, Archdiocese of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

  • a priest for 32.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast