Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Germaine-Marie Lalande, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Holy Cross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1911Born
16 Aug 193423.4Final VowsMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
31 Jan 193725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
30 Jul 196251.3AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Holy Cross
1974²62.7CeasedSuperior General of Congregation of Holy Cross
14 Sep 199685.4DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of Holy Cross

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Germaine-Marie Lalande
Father Germaine-Marie Lalande C.S.C. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Holy Cross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Placide, Archdiocese of Québec, Canada
Death PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada

  • a priest for 59.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2019

Quantcast