Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marcelino Lardizábal Aguirrebengoa, I.E.M.E. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Sinú-San Jorge, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1879Born
Dec 190223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Instituto Espańol de San Francisco Javier para Misiones Extranjeras
4 Mar 192545.7AppointedPrefect of Sinú, Colombia
194969.5ResignedPrefect of Sinú-San Jorge, Colombia
6 Jan 195878.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Sinú-San Jorge, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Lardizábal Aguirrebengoa
Father Marcelino Lardizábal Aguirrebengoa I.E.M.E. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Sinú-San Jorge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIdiazábal, Spain
Death PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a priest for 55.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast