Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasij Aleksander Krupeckyj

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1609AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
20 Jun 1610Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
6 May 1652³DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Atanasij Aleksander Krupeckyj:
Bishop Atanasij Aleksander Krupeckyj (died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 271
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,735
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015