Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Łukasz Kaliński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
22 Jun 162648.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
22 Jun 162648.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
15 May 163355.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Łukasz Kaliński (VIAF: 166109190)
Bishop Łukasz Kaliński (born 1578, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 47
  • nm/d: CB, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast