Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul-Marie-Joseph Julliotte, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Hainan [Hainan]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1867BornBrunoy, France
29 Jun 189326.1Ordained PriestPriest
190032.6ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
20 Nov 192962.5AppointedSuperior of Hainan [Hainan], China
30 Jun 193669.1AppointedPrefect of Hainan [Hainan], China
Feb 193971.7ResignedPrefect of Hainan [Hainan], China
30 Aug 195689.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Hainan [Hainan], China

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie-Joseph Julliotte:
Father Paul-Marie-Joseph Julliotte SS.CC. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Hainan [Hainan]

  • a priest for 63.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015