Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hildebrand Jost

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1585Born
15 Oct 161327.9SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
6 Sep 161428.7ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
7 Dec 161429.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
16 May 1638³52.4DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hildebrand Jost
Bishop Hildebrand Jost (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSion, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 309
  • b/c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast