Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Wilhelm von Jülich-Kleve-Berg

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1562Born
28 Apr 157411.9SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
20 Sep 157917.3ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
18 May 158522.9ResignedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany
25 Mar 160946.8DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Wilhelm von Jülich-Kleve-Berg (VIAF: 38004841)
Father Johann Wilhelm von Jülich-Kleve-Berg (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Münster

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast