Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas James

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1478AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
29 Mar 1482AppointedBishop of Dol, France
5 Apr 1504DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Thomas James
Bishop Thomas James (died ) Bishop of Dol

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175, and Page 145
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,478, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast