Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Isenberg, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Nov 1466AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
12 Nov 1466AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
12 Apr 1467Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
2 Sep 1484DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Isenberg
Bishop Johann Isenberg O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHopital Teutonique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 250
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,489
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,467, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast