Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wincenty Ilgin

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Kharkov, Russian Federation


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1886Born
1909²22.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mohilev, Belarus
15 Aug 192640.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kharkov, Russian Federation
24 Aug 193751.5DiedApostolic Administrator of Kharkov, Russian Federation

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Ilgin
Father Wincenty Ilgin (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Kharkov

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDwiniucza
Death PlaceWarszawa

  • a priest for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 29 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017