Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giwargis Peter (Georges-Pierre) Mawlada (de Natali)

Deceased

Bishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean)


Events

DateEventTitle
1830²Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 1835Ordained BishopBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Chaldean), Turkey
1842²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
12 Jan 1847AppointedBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
14 Aug 1867DiedBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giwargis Peter (Georges-Pierre) Mawlada (de Natali)
Bishop Giwargis Peter (Georges-Pierre) Mawlada (de Natali) (died ) Bishop of Diarbekir (Amida)

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,328
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244
  • ob: ATh, 22 Nov 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,637

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 Feb 2016