Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Goldener, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹Born
14 Jan 145151.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
14 Jan 145151.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
21 Feb 145151.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
147474.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
25 Apr 147575.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Goldener (VIAF: 33194978)
Bishop Johann Goldener O.S.A. (born 1400, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNürnberg
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aquiro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 78
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,594
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1451, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast